This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:49:33 (UTC).

Ultrra vs AboveGEM, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Ultrra filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against AboveGEM, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Zayner, Theodore C, Walsh, Brian C, Takaichi, Drew C and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5990

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

Walsh, Brian C

Takaichi, Drew C

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Utrra

Ultrra

Oji, Alex

Evaji, Ahmad

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AboveGM, Inc.

Wang, Oliver

AboveGEM, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Vantress, Robert Matthew

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Dutta, Gautam

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: *continued from 2-5-19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Proof of Service: Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Notice of Change of Address - Proof of Service required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Order - Comment: DENYING Plaintiff's and Defendant's 2-5-19 motions - signed by Judge Pierce *see order for details*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Notice - Comment: of Defendants' Lodging of Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Reserved - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Motion for Sanctions (Non-Discovery) by Defs Above GEM Inc. (Gautam Dutta) 415-236-2048 af 11-19-18

    Read MoreRead Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2018
  • Order - Comment: GRANTED see filing for details, Hearing set on 05-07-18 at 8:45AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Declaration: In Opposition - Comment: Declaration in opposition to Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Dutta.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • First Paper Filed - Fee - Comment: Taken on opposition to exparte application.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Supplemental re: Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Vantress.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Vantress.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Vantress.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies) - Comment: Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Vantress.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less