This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 01:10:25 (UTC).

USA Waste Of California, Inc. vs Sabby Investment Co. Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 USA Waste Of California, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sabby Investment Co Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8847

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA Waste Of California, Inc.

Defendant

Sabby Investment Co. Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christina Melhouse

Defendant Attorney

Eileen Patricia Kennedy

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/25/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Amended): From <$10K to up to $25K

5/25/2022 Complaint (Amended): From <$10K to up to $25K

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

6/10/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

7/11/2022 Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

Court Trial: Short Cause

5/15/2023 Court Trial: Short Cause

Court Trial: Short Cause

5/15/2023 Court Trial: Short Cause

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Court Trial: Short Cause; Department: Department 1; Time: 8:46AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K; Filed By: Sabby Investment Co. Inc.,; Comment: To complaint; atty; Kennedy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: USA Waste Of California, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Amended): From <$10K to up to $25K; Filed By: USA Waste Of California, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: USA Waste Of California, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: USA Waste Of California, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eileen P. Kennedy