This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 12:37:38 (UTC).

URI Refrigeration, Inc. vs Procon Professional Contractors, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2012 URI Refrigeration, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Procon Professional Contractors, Inc ,. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8460

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

URI Refrigerations, Inc.

Defendants

GDK Enterprises, LLC

American Contractors Indemnity Company

Procon Professional Contractors, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Lewis Pintar

Defendant Attorneys

Judith J. Rentschler

Dawna J. Cilluffo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2012
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Demurrer; Department: Department 2; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Heard: sustained without leav to amend

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketDescription: Demurrer; Filed By: GDK Enterprises, LLC,; Comment: Text = to Complaint Atty: Benjamin A. Sange 8/28/12, 9am, D2 Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Demurrer, Unltd Decision = M Closed = 07/26/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketDescription: Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day; Filed By: GDK Enterprises, LLC,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Per Diem Fees Decision = M Closed = 07/26/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketDescription: Demurrer; Filed By: GDK Enterprises, LLC,; Comment: Text = to Complaint Atty: Benjamin A. Sange 8/28/12, 9am, D2 Legacy Name = CV Demurrer, no fees Decision = M Closed = 07/26/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: GDK Enterprises, LLC,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Demurrer Decision = M Closed = 07/26/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement; Filed By: URI Refrigerations, Inc., GDK Enterprises, LLC,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 07/24/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Set for: further CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: URI Refrigerations, Inc.,; Comment: Text = atty Pintar Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 06/25/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Procon Professional Contractors, Inc.,; Comment: Text = atty Dawna J. Cilluffo Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 06/14/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: URI Refrigerations, Inc., American Contractors Indemnity Company,; Comment: Text = (Atty Cilluffo) Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 04/12/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: URI Refrigerations, Inc., Procon Professional Contractors, Inc.,; Comment: Text = (Atty Cilluffo) Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 04/12/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: URI Refrigerations, Inc., American Contractors Indemnity Company,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/12/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: URI Refrigerations, Inc., GDK Enterprises, LLC,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/02/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: URI Refrigerations, Inc., Procon Professional Contractors, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/02/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: URI Refrigerations, Inc., Procon Professional Contractors, Inc., GDK Enterprises, LLC, American Contractors Indemnity Company,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 02/10/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: URI Refrigerations, Inc., Procon Professional Contractors, Inc., GDK Enterprises, LLC, American Contractors Indemnity Company,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 02/10/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: URI Refrigerations, Inc., Procon Professional Contractors, Inc., GDK Enterprises, LLC, American Contractors Indemnity Company,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 02/10/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less