This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 04:41:25 (UTC).

United Rentals (North America), Inc. vs Precision Drilling, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 United Rentals North America , Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Precision Drilling, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2974

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Rentals (North America), Inc.

Defendants

Precision Drilling, Inc.

Tyrone Dennis Amundson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard Goodman

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

9/27/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

9/27/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/25/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/25/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: United Rentals (North America), Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: United Rentals (North America), Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: United Rentals (North America), Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: United Rentals (North America), Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: United Rentals (North America), Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Precision Drilling Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Rentals, Inc, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Goodman, Howard