This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 09:40:02 (UTC).

Unifund CCR, LLC vs T. Martin

Case Summary

On 02/05/2014 Unifund CCR, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against T Martin. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Nadler, Jerome S and Shapero, Kenneth L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8019

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Nadler, Jerome S

Shapero, Kenneth L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unifund Ccr, Llc

Defendants

Timothy P Martin

Martin, Timothy P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth J. Miele

8581 Santa Monica Blvd, #17

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Miele, Kenneth J.

Defendant Attorney

Connolly, Crosby S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Martin, Timothy P; Party: Name: Unifund CCR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Martin, Timothy P; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Unifund CCR, LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Unifund CCR, LLC; Judgment Amount: $22,835.53; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Martin, Timothy P; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $0.00; Other: $22,835.53; Total: $22835.53; Comment: printdate=Oct 28 2014; freetext=total judgment: $22,835.53; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Oct 28 2014; judgstatusdate=Oct 28 2014; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=09LT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Comment: 02/19/15, Los Angeles, Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Comment: FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Text = LA; $23,423.52. Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 02/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Text = Cost: $75; interest: $487.99. Atty Tasby. Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 02/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 11/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Judgment: Default - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Text = total judgment: $22,835.53 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 10/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Declaration: CCP 585 - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 10/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Declaration: In Support - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Text = of assignment of account Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support Decision = M Closed = 10/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Text = of authorized representative in lieu of live testimony (atty Miele) Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 06/27/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Text = strike the answer and notify all sides; mailed 05/28/14 ck Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 05/27/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Request: Action - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Text = file to judge D105 Legacy Name = CV Request for Action/Ord Decision = M Closed = 05/27/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Nadler, Jerome S; Comment: Text = denied Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = D Closed = 05/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Nadler, Jerome S; Comment: Text = file to Judge/ D105 Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 05/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Declaration: Re: Diligence - Judicial Officer: Nadler, Jerome S; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Diligence Decision = M Closed = 04/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Nadler, Jerome S; Comment: Text = subserved Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Nadler, Jerome S; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 02/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Nadler, Jerome S; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 02/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K - Judicial Officer: Nadler, Jerome S; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss >$10k Decision = M Closed = 02/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less