This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/14/2022 at 18:03:06 (UTC).

Valenzuela, et al. v. Owens Corning Insulating Systems, LLC (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 Valenzuela, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Owens Corning Insulating Systems, LLC Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3164

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ulises Valenzuela

Clint Francis

Defendant

Owens Corning Insulating Systems, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David R. Markham

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/15/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/15/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/15/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

9/19/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/14/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Ulises Valenzuela, Clint Francis,; Comment: HRG 2-1-23 Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Ulises Valenzuela, Clint Francis,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Ulises Valenzuela, Clint Francis,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Class Action * Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Ulises Valenzuela, Clint Francis,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant