This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:11:18 (UTC).

U. Singh vs A. Kumar

Case Summary

On 11/03/2014 U Singh filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against A Kumar. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Elfving, William J, Stoelker, James L, Strickland, Elizabeth, Arand, Mary E and Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2725

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Elfving, William J

Stoelker, James L

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Uday Singh

Singh, Uday

Shirdo Sai Darbar

Taylor, Trinity

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Ashok Kumar

Kumar, Ashok

Shirdi Sai Darbar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Robyn C. Callahan

1855 Market Str.

San Francisco, CA 94103

Taylor, Trinity

Horn, Charles Henry

Whitecavage, Joseph Anthony

Shem, Mark W

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Ellenberg, Steven A.

Suess, Matthew K.

Pappy, Elizabeth M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Substitution of Attorney - Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Notice: Association/Co-Counsel - Comment: Association of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Court Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Est. 6 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Conference: Settlement - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Pro Tem John P. McDonnell - Dept. 6 Jury Room

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Statement: Settlement Conference - Comment: Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Statement: Settlement Conference - Comment: Plaintiff Singh's Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Statement: Settlement Conference - Comment: Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Order - Comment: Allowing Another Attorney From His Firm Familiar with the Case to Appear in Place of Attorney Charles Horn on Behalf of Cross-Defendant Uday Singh, Granted by Judge Kulkarni

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: Granting Stip & Order for Protective Order by Judge Kulkarni

    Read MoreRead Less
279 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2014
  • Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour Decision = M Closed = 12/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = to Complt; memo of p's & a's Atty: Pappy 2/5/15, 9am, D3 Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Demurrer, Unltd Decision = M Closed = 12/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Jury Fee Deposit - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit Decision = M Closed = 12/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour Decision = M Closed = 12/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = to Complaint 2/05/15 @ 9:00AM D-03 Atty Ellenberg Legacy Name = CV Demurrer, no fees Decision = M Closed = 12/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = Taken on demurrer Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd Decision = M Closed = 12/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 11/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 11/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 11/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less