Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:39:32 (UTC).

Tyler-Fawn Cash vs Iam Rodriquez

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Tyler-Fawn Cash filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Iam Rodriquez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, Irene. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4988

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, Irene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cash, Tyler-Fawn

Defendants

Rodriguez, Iam M

Rodriquez, Iam M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Comment: Comment (No appearance. Case DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.); Party: Names: Cash, Tyler-Fawn; Rodriquez, Iam M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fee Paid $75.00 No POS as of 10/09/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim (Amended) (No change in no claim amount) - Comment: Change spelling of last name of Def. and address only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee) - Comment: Reset req'd by plt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less