This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 07/25/2022 at 05:33:26 (UTC).

TWC Storage, LLC vs Quology Construction Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2007 TWC Storage, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Quology Construction Inc ,. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4729

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

Clayton Group Services, Inc.

Cross Plaintiff

Bureau Veritas North America, Inc.

Cross Defendants

Campanella Corporation

TWC Storage, LLC

Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.

Not Yet Classified

Qualogy Construction Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Dori L. Yob

Other Attorneys

Jeffrey S. Lawson

James M. Sturdivant

Robert G. Crow

Larry Jen Ho Liu

 

Court Documents

55 Exhibit A.pdf

9/20/2007 55 Exhibit A.pdf

20 First Amended Complaint manually filed November 19 2007.pdf

9/20/2007 20 First Amended Complaint manually filed November 19 2007.pdf

53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CROSS COMPLAINTS AND FO.pdf

9/20/2007 53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CROSS COMPLAINTS AND FO.pdf

57 Request Dismissal Entire With Prejudice.pdf

9/20/2007 57 Request Dismissal Entire With Prejudice.pdf

15 Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Complaint manually filed October 24 20.pdf

9/20/2007 15 Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Complaint manually filed October 24 20.pdf

52 Qualogy Construction Inc s Answer to Bureau Veritas North America s Cross.pdf

9/20/2007 52 Qualogy Construction Inc s Answer to Bureau Veritas North America s Cross.pdf

48 Answer of TWC Storage LLC to Cross complaint of Qualogy Construction Inc.pdf

9/20/2007 48 Answer of TWC Storage LLC to Cross complaint of Qualogy Construction Inc.pdf

45 Answer of Advanced Micro Devices Inc to Cross complaint of Bureau Veritas.pdf

9/20/2007 45 Answer of Advanced Micro Devices Inc to Cross complaint of Bureau Veritas.pdf

47 Answer of TWC Storage LLC to Cross complaint of Bureau Veritas North Ameri.pdf

9/20/2007 47 Answer of TWC Storage LLC to Cross complaint of Bureau Veritas North Ameri.pdf

26 Campanella Corporation s Answer to First Amended Cross Complaint manually .pdf

9/20/2007 26 Campanella Corporation s Answer to First Amended Cross Complaint manually .pdf

58 Proof of Electronic Service.pdf

9/20/2007 58 Proof of Electronic Service.pdf

54 SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SU.pdf

9/20/2007 54 SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SU.pdf

44 Case Management Statement.pdf

9/20/2007 44 Case Management Statement.pdf

55 DECLARATION OF JON A ROSSO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CR.pdf

9/20/2007 55 DECLARATION OF JON A ROSSO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CR.pdf

24 Cross Complaint by Campanella Corporation sued herein as Campanella Constr.pdf

9/20/2007 24 Cross Complaint by Campanella Corporation sued herein as Campanella Constr.pdf

57 Exhibit.pdf

9/20/2007 57 Exhibit.pdf

55 Proof of Electronic Service.pdf

9/20/2007 55 Proof of Electronic Service.pdf

5 Application and Order Allowing Amendment to Complaint manually filed Octobe.pdf

9/20/2007 5 Application and Order Allowing Amendment to Complaint manually filed Octobe.pdf

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2009
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Text = EF #G-17908 Judge Jack Komar's Retirement Notice + Proof of E-Service Legacy Name = CV Clerk's Notice Decision = M Closed = 09/01/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2008
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication; Department: Department 17; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Off Calendar by court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2008
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 17; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2008
  • HearingDescription: Reserved: Summary Judgment; Department: Department 17; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Off calendar: moving papers not filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2008
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Bureau Veritas North America, Inc.,; Comment: Text = to x-complaint filed 12-28-07 (Larry Liu) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 08/04/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2008
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: TWC Storage, LLC,; Comment: Text = #G-9826 Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 07/22/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2008
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: TWC Storage, LLC, Qualogy Construction Inc., Campanella Corporation, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.,; Comment: Text = EF #G-9714 Dismissal With Prejudice of Qualogy Construction, Inc.'s Cross-Complaint, filed January 25, 2008 (Atty William S. Krein) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 07/15/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Campanella Corporation,; Comment: Text = EF #G-9651 Dismissal With Prejudice of Campanella Construction's Cross-Complaint, filed December 28, 2007 (Atty Robert G. Cros) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 07/15/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: TWC Storage, LLC, Qualogy Construction Inc., Campanella Corporation, Clayton Group Services, Inc., Bureau Veritas North America, Inc.,; Comment: Text = EF #G-9655 Dismissal With Prejudice of Complaint (Atty Jeffrey S. Lawson) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 07/15/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 17; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Vacated: settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: 17 Proof of Electronic Service.pdf; Effective Date: 9/20/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: 16 Proof of Electronic Service.pdf; Effective Date: 9/20/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: 13 Proof of Electronic Service.pdf; Effective Date: 9/20/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: 11 Proof of Electronic Service.pdf; Effective Date: 9/20/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: 46 Answer of Advanced Micro Devices Inc to Cross complaint of Qualogy Constr.pdf; Effective Date: 9/20/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: 14 Proof of Electronic Service.pdf; Effective Date: 9/20/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: 12 Proof of Electronic Service.pdf; Effective Date: 9/20/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: TWC Storage, LLC, Qualogy Construction Inc., Campanella Corporation, Clayton Group Services, Inc., Bureau Veritas North America, Inc.,; Comment: Text = (Atty Lawson) Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 09/20/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: TWC Storage, LLC, Qualogy Construction Inc., Campanella Corporation, Clayton Group Services, Inc., Bureau Veritas North America, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 09/20/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUREAU VERITAS NORTH AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry Jen Ho Liu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey S. Lawson