This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:41 (UTC).

Tuyet Vinh Thi Tran vs Bao Q. Tran

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Tuyet Vinh Thi Tran filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Bao Q Tran. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCracken, JoAnne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0164

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCracken, JoAnne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tran, Tuyet Vinh Thi

Respondent

Tran, Bao Q.

Minor

Tran, Wilson Khanh

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Tran, Tuyet Vinh Thi; Tran, Bao Q.; Tran, Wilson Khanh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Comment: 1-29-2019. Granted. Sent to the Clerk's office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Comment: 11-14-2018. Rejected. in ps/pu Sue Tachovsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Comment: 11-14-2018. Rejected. in ps/pu Sue Tachovsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Comment: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p) com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: re: shared residence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less