This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:48:42 (UTC).

Tuyet Le vs Kelly Kieu Nhu

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Tuyet Le filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Kelly Kieu Nhu. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, Irene and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5964

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, Irene

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Le, Tuyet An

Defendants

Kieu Nhu, Kelly

Kelly V Collection

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Le, Tuyet An; Awarded Against: Kieu Nhu, Kelly; Amount; Damages: $600.00; Costs: $30.00; Total: $630.00; Party: Names: Le, Tuyet An; Kieu Nhu, Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid: $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Comment: Hrg: 1/25/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid: $30.00. No POS filed as of 11/18/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: Amended claim. Reset date to have time to serve Def.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less

    Read MoreRead Less