Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 02:01:51 (UTC).

Tully Medical Clinic vs Jerry Jones

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 a Property - Commercial Eviction case was filed by Tully Medical Clinic against Jerry Jones in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9371

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Overton, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tully Medical Clinic

Claimant

Lavender Rose Day Spa

Defendant

Jones, Jerry

Not Yet Classified

All Unnamed Occupants

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Takaichi, Drew C; Judgment Type: Court Finding (CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: Tully Medical Clinic; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1693 Flanigan Dr., Suite #105, San Jose, CA 95121; Awarded Against: Jones, Jerry; Party: Names: Tully Medical Clinic; Jones, Jerry; All Unnamed Occupants; Lavender Rose Day Spa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Takaichi, Drew C; Judgment Type: Court Finding (CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: Tully Medical Clinic; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1693 Flanigan Drive, Suite #105, San Jose, CA 95121; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: Jones, Jerry; Must Pay; Attorney Fees: $1,000.00; Costs: $441.95; Total: $1,441.95; Party: Names: Tully Medical Clinic; Jones, Jerry; All Unnamed Occupants; Lavender Rose Day Spa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: Tully Medical Clinic; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1693 Flanigan Drive, Suite #105, San Jose, CA 95121; Awarded Against: Jones, Jerry; Party: Names: Tully Medical Clinic; Jones, Jerry; All Unnamed Occupants; Lavender Rose Day Spa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Filed) - Comment: issued 8/10/18, satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Issued) - Comment: 1693 Flanigan Dr., Suite #105, San Jose, CA 95121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Judgment - Comment: 1693 Flanigan Drive, Suite #105, San Jose, CA 95121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Judgment - Comment: 1693 Flanigan Dr., Suite #105, San Jose, CA 95121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Court Trial - Judicial Officer: Takaichi, Drew C; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Case ReOpened

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: RE: Lavender Rose Day Spa Lavender Rose Day Spa is not a party in the case, a prejudgment claim of right to possession is required before adding parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Answer to complaint - this document should be on an adopted judicial council forms or follow certain judicial council format. This doc also require a $225 filing fee. See rejection letter for more detail.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Re: Letter dated 6/12/18 from Lavender Rose Day Spa.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Complaint-Unlawful Detainer (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less