This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:59 (UTC).

Tu Thi Cam Kien vs Khoa Nguyen

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Tu Thi Cam Kien filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Khoa Nguyen. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowen, Beth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0168

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

McGowen, Beth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kien, Tu Thi Cam

Respondent

Nguyen, Khoa

Minors

Nguyen, Khe Ngoc Song

Nguyen, Khuyen Ngoc Thien

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nguyen, Teresa T.N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Kien, Tu Thi Cam; Nguyen, Khoa; Nguyen, Khuyen Ngoc Thien; Nguyen, Khe Ngoc Song

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Nguyen 9/6 by agreement-MV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee - Comment: Sharon Roper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Response, UCCJEA, Declaration of Khoa Nguyen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: of Khoa Nguyen That Children Lived In Vietnam and not United States of America at the time This action was commenced and that this court should decline jurisdiction over children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less