This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 06/24/2022 at 18:06:40 (UTC).

Truchinski v. Hologic, Inc. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 Truchinski filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Hologic, Inc Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7278

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Truchinski

Defendant

Hologic, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mehrdad Bokhour

Joshua Samson Falakassa

Defendant Attorneys

Stacey Eileen James

Nicholas Lansdown

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/25/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Civil Lawsuit Notice

4/25/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/25/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/25/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/25/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service

4/26/2022 Proof of Service

Order: Deeming Case Complex

4/26/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Electronic

5/20/2022 Proof of Service: Electronic

Notice: Appearance

5/20/2022 Notice: Appearance

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

6/2/2022 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Order

6/2/2022 Order

Declaration: In Support

6/2/2022 Declaration: In Support

Request

6/2/2022 Request

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request; Filed By: William Truchinski,; Comment: Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal of Class Claims Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: William Truchinski,; Comment: Mehrdad Bokhour Declaration ISO Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal of Class Claims Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: William Truchinski,; Comment: Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal of Class Claims Without Prejudice - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: William Truchinski,; Comment: First Amended PAGA Representative Action Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Appearance; Filed By: Hologic, Inc.,; Comment: Notice of Appearance of Defendant Hologic, Inc. + Complex Fee Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Hologic, Inc.,; Comment: Proof of Service-Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: William Truchinski,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: William Truchinski,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: William Truchinski,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: William Truchinski,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 9/8/22 at 2:30pm in D1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: William Truchinski,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLOGIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara