Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:40:46 (UTC).

Trinidad Rodriguez vs Andrea Martinez

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse case was filed by Trinidad Rodriguez against Andrea Martinez in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0071

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Overton, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Trinidad

Defendant

Martinez, Andrea

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Order to Show Cause: RO EA - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Heard: Granted - UnContested; Comment: Granted - POS filed on 7/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Order: Restraining Order After Hearing - Comment: 3 years exp. 8/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: clets

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: RE:CV5014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Request and Order: TRO Elder Abuse (EA-110)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Notice: Court Hearing TRO Elder Abuse (EA-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Request: Order to Stop Elder Abuse (EA-100)

    Read MoreRead Less