This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 23:19:13 (UTC).

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America vs Roem Builders, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 Travelers Property Casualty Company of America filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Roem Builders, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6357

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Domain Residences / Land and Houses USA, Inc., a California Corporation

Defendant

American Contractors Indemnity Company

Not Yet Classified

Roem Builders, Inc.

American Contractors Indemnity Company, as Surety for TKM Plumbing Inc.

TKM Plumbing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Wesley Blaisdell

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Vinson Stearns

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Lauren A. Pagan

Samuel Arnold Wyman

Jessica Brynn Coffield

Daniel L. Casas

Gino Cano

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

12/14/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

12/14/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

12/14/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

12/14/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

12/14/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/29/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/29/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

7/8/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

7/8/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Clerk Rejection Letter

7/21/2020 Clerk Rejection Letter

Cross-Complaint

7/23/2020 Cross-Complaint

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/23/2020 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Statement: Case Management Conference

8/11/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/23/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/24/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/24/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/29/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: TKM Plumbing, Inc.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: American Contractors Indemnity Company,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: American Contractors Indemnity Company, as Surety for TKM Plumbing Inc.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Domain Residences / Land and Houses USA, Inc., a California Corporation,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Roem Builders, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer: Cross Complaint; Filed By: TKM Plumbing, Inc.,; Comment: to amended cross complaint, atty Cano

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application for Refund; Comment: overpayment of Jury fees of 150.00 to be refunded to Plts atty.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: Roem Builders, Inc.,; Comment: Cross Complaint against TKM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Roem Builders, Inc., American Contractors Indemnity Company,; Comment: To complaint; Atty: Stearns

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America,; Comment: ENV#4631542 / FAC: As name of a Defendant (American Contractors Indemnity) is being changed, a court order is required to file a FAC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint on American Contractors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint on Roem Builders

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roem Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TKM PLUMBING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant