This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/11/2022 at 18:04:31 (UTC).

Tovar v. California Skin Institute Management, LLC, et al. (PAGA)

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 Tovar filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against California Skin Institute Management, LLC, PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3021

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRISTELL TOVAR

Defendants

GREG S MORGANROTH

CALIFORNIA SKIN INSTITUTE MANAGEMENT, LLC

CALIFORNIA SKIN INSTITUTE HOLDINGS, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David D Bibiyan

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/12/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/12/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Lawsuit Notice

9/13/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Order: Deeming Case Complex

9/15/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Notice

9/19/2022 Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC reset from 2/2/23 to 1/19/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 2/2/23 at 2:30pm in D1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: KRISTELL TOVAR,; Comment: Representative Action Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: KRISTELL TOVAR,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * PAGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: KRISTELL TOVAR,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Skin Institute Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant