This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/21/2021 at 03:33:14 (UTC).

Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc. vs Shamrock Tank Lines, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2016 Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Shamrock Tank Lines, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3258

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.

Defendants

Shamrock Tank Lines, Inc.

Hovanes Nadjarian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph P. Thompson

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/12/2016 Minute Order

Minute Order

2/7/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

10/12/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

12/5/2017 Minute Order

Notice: Entry of Order

12/11/2017 Notice: Entry of Order

Writ: Execution (Filed)

2/7/2018 Writ: Execution (Filed)

Writ: Attachment (Filed)

2/20/2018 Writ: Attachment (Filed)

Memorandum of Costs

5/7/2018 Memorandum of Costs

Memorandum of Costs

5/7/2018 Memorandum of Costs

Memorandum of Costs

5/7/2018 Memorandum of Costs

Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

5/7/2018 Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

Writ: Execution (Filed)

11/15/2018 Writ: Execution (Filed)

Memorandum of Costs

10/28/2019 Memorandum of Costs

Memorandum of Costs

2/1/2021 Memorandum of Costs

Application: Renewal Judgment

9/20/2021 Application: Renewal Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued

9/20/2021 Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued

Proof of Service: Mail

9/20/2021 Proof of Service: Mail

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application: Renewal Judgment; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: SHAMROCK TANK LINES INC. AND HOVANES NADJARIAN, $28,969.89

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, And Declaration of Accrued Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc., Shamrock Tank Lines, Inc., Hovanes Nadjarian,; Comment: 10/16/17, Los Angeles, Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: Cost $8484.00 Credit $9737.02 Interest $2101.43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2016
  • DocketDescription: Request: Judicial Notice; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: No.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • DocketDescription: Request: Judicial Notice; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: No.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: Kristine Le

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • DocketDescription: Application: Right to Attach Order; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: atty: Thompson 06/07/16 @ 9am, dept. 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketDescription: Undertaking; Filed By: Joseph Thompson, Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: $10,000 bond # 3379562

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketDescription: Petition (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less