This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/07/2022 at 03:16:50 (UTC).

Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc. vs Jane Doe et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2017 Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Jane Doe. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9564

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.

Defendants

Corinthian Ground Transportation L.A., Inc.

Corinthian International Parking Services, Inc.

Corinthian International Perking Services, Inc.

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Patrick Thompson

Defendant Attorney

Caryn N. Fabian

 

Court Documents

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

8/23/2018 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/27/2017 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

11/27/2017 Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/27/2017 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/13/2017 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/13/2017 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Mail

1/22/2018 Proof of Service: Mail

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/22/2018 Statement: Case Management Conference

Default Entered

2/16/2018 Default Entered

Minute Order

4/6/2018 Minute Order

Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

4/26/2018 Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

Proof of Service: Mail

8/6/2018 Proof of Service: Mail

Declaration

8/6/2018 Declaration

Amendment

8/6/2018 Amendment

Request: Dismissal

8/8/2018 Request: Dismissal

Minute Order

8/24/2018 Minute Order

Answer (Limited): Up to $10K

11/13/2018 Answer (Limited): Up to $10K

Proof of Service

12/20/2018 Proof of Service

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: Proof of Service by Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: Corinthian International Parking Services, Inc.,; Comment: to Complaint. Atty Fabian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Department: Department 9; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: Partial, Without Prejudice, as to Def Corinthian Ground Transportation L.A. Inc. ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: Proof of Service: Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amendment; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: naming Doe 1 - Corinthian International Parking Services, Inc. aka Corinthian Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 9; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Default Entered; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,; Comment: BASIC only; No judgment form was submitted to process as a Court Default.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc., Corinthian Ground Transportation L.A., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc., Corinthian Ground Transportation L.A., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less