This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/16/2021 at 22:32:26 (UTC).

Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc. vs Rammohan Singh et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Tom Lopes Distributing Co , Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rammohan Singh. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0793

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc.

Defendants

Postal Delivery Systems, LLC

Rammohan Singh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Patrick Thompson

 

Court Documents

Request: Dismissal

9/28/2020 Request: Dismissal

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/16/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/16/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc.,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less