This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/05/2022 at 16:06:39 (UTC).

Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc. vs R. Rascon

Case Summary

On 06/10/2015 Tom Lopes Distributing Co , Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against R Rascon. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1649

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc.

Defendants

Rudolph G Rascon

Rudolph G. Rascon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph P. Thompson

Defendant Attorney

Scott J Sagaria

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/23/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

1/18/2018 Minute Order

Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice

3/19/2018 Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice

Affidavit

3/19/2018 Affidavit

Review: Case Status

1/18/2018 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

1/18/2018 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

1/18/2018 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

1/18/2018 Review: Case Status

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc.,; Comment: Declaration of Joseph P. Thompson RE: OSC 2/2218

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc.,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 8; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Stay of Proceedings All Parties; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc.,; Comment: re: Bankruptcy (Joseph P. Thompson)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketDescription: Restored to court's control

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Bankruptcy/Stay; Filed By: Rudolph Rascon,; Comment: as to Rudolph G. Rascon aka Rudy Rascon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketDescription: Complaint: Amendment To (New Party); Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc., Rudolph Rascon,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc., Rudolph Rascon,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketDescription: Default Not Entered; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc., Rudolph Rascon,; Comment: Text = Defendants name does not match Summons and complaint. Legacy Name = CV Default Not Entered Decision = M Closed = 12/01/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Change Address/Firm Name; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Change of Atty address/Firm Decision = M Closed = 11/02/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • DocketDescription: Default Not Entered; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc., Rudolph Rascon,; Comment: Text = On 9/2/15 default Items 1c, 1d and 6b (1) are incorrect; summons does not match complaint Legacy Name = CV Default Not Entered Decision = M Closed = 11/03/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketDescription: Default Not Entered; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc., Rudolph Rascon,; Comment: Text = Items 1c, 1d and 6b (1) are incorrect; summons does not match complaint Legacy Name = CV Default Not Entered Decision = M Closed = 11/03/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc., Rudolph Rascon,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/31/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc., Rudolph Rascon,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc., Rudolph Rascon,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 06/10/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc., Rudolph Rascon,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/No Summs Iss <$10k Decision = M Closed = 06/10/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less