This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/22/2021 at 05:35:44 (UTC).

Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc vs In Motion Transportation, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2016 Tom Lopes Distributing Co , Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against In Motion Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2366

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc

Defendants

In Motion Transportation, Inc

Nelson R Diaz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph P. Thompson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/19/2016

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc, Nelson Diaz,; Comment: (changed to Enforcement of Judgment -20)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2016

DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc, Nelson Diaz,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2016

DocketDescription: Other; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc, Nelson Diaz,; Comment: In Proceedings In Aid Of Execution, Notice of Default

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2016

DocketDescription: Judgment: Renewal; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc, Nelson Diaz,; Comment: $7769.81

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2016

DocketDescription: Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc, Nelson Diaz,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2016

DocketDescription: Application: Renewal Judgment; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc,; Comment: $7769.81, In Motion Transportation, Inc., aka In Motion Trans, Inc. Nelson R. Diaz

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2016

DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc, Nelson Diaz,; Comment: Total: $8,270.71, Credit: $24,145.00, $11,296.86

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2015

DocketDescription: Notice: Change Address/Firm Name; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Change of Atty address/Firm Decision = M Closed = 11/02/2015

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2013

DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc, Nelson Diaz,; Comment: Text = cost-$8,270.71, credit-$14,645.00, interest-$8,844.14 mailed 12/9/13 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2013

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2012

DocketDescription: Notice: Change Address/Firm Name; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Change of Atty address/Firm Decision = M Closed = 10/19/2012

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
68 More Docket Entries
03/14/2008

DocketDescription: Judgment: Default; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc, Nelson Diaz,; Comment: Text = total judgment - $12,317.24 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 03/14/2008

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2008

DocketDescription: Default Pending; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc, Nelson Diaz,; Comment: Text = file to judge/d92 Legacy Name = CV Default Pending Decision = M Closed = 03/13/2008

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2008

DocketDescription: Declaration: CCP 585; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc, Nelson Diaz,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 03/13/2008

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2008

DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, Nelson Diaz,; Comment: Text = personal Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/04/2008

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2008

DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc, Nelson Diaz,; Comment: Text = costs $430.00 Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 02/20/2008

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2007

DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc,; Comment: Text = personal Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/21/2007

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2007

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 09/13/2007

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2007

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc, Nelson Diaz,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 09/13/2007

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2007

DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, In Motion Transportation, Inc, Nelson Diaz,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss <$10k Decision = M Closed = 09/13/2007

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2007

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less