This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/06/2022 at 08:10:41 (UTC).

Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc vs F. Khan

Case Summary

On 09/04/2015 Tom Lopes Distributing Co , Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against F Khan. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5333

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc

Defendant

Fayyaz Ahmed Khan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph P. Thompson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2015
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc,; Comment: Text = Atty Joseph P. Thompson Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 10/20/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, Fayyaz Khan,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 09/04/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, Fayyaz Khan,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss <$10k Decision = M Closed = 09/04/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Tom Lopes Distributing Co., Inc, Fayyaz Khan,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 09/04/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less