Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:43:08 (UTC).

Todd Tuner et al vs Michael McElwrtah et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Todd Tuner filed an Other lawsuit against Michael McElwrtah. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Stoelker, James L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3185

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Stoelker, James L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Streed, Scott

DeLorenzo, Debra J.

Bjeland, Lief

Mungle, Kevin

Naggar, David

Smith, Sharon

Wooten, Frank

Perl, Martin

DeLorenzo, Ralph

Lewis, Nicholas J.

Sulivan, Patrick

Tuner, Todd

Wasserman, Harold

Wasserman, Joan

Defendants

Juckett, Donald A.

Nahmias, David

Whitley, Jennifer

Chiang, C.P.

McElwrtah, Michael R.

Willams, Huw

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Naggar, David

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Naggar, David; McElwrath, Michael R.; Whitley, Jennifer; Chiang, C.P.; Mihm, John C.; Wiliams, Tom; Nahmias, David; Juckett, Donald A.; Willams, Huw; Far Eastern Entergy Corporation; Far Eastern Energy; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Notice of Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Bulk Scanned Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Transfer In: Unlimited - Comment: From San Diego County Prev. ID 37-2017-00042892-CU-NP-CTL ***FIRST PAPER REQUIRED FOR ALL DEFENDANTS***

    Read MoreRead Less