Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 06:44:54 (UTC).

Tina Tragarz vs Kyle Edwards

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 Tina Tragarz filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Kyle Edwards. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C, Steingart, Lisa and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5641

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Steingart, Lisa

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tragarz, Tina L

Defendant

Edwards, Kyle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Tragarz, Tina L; Awarded Against: Edwards, Kyle; Amount; Damages: $8,000.00; Costs: $75.00; Total: $8075.00; Comment: Defendant's claim is dismissed without prejudice. No appearance by Defendant. Judgment mailed 9/18/17.; Party: Names: Tragarz, Tina L; Edwards, Kyle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Tragarz, Tina L; Awarded Against: Edwards, Kyle; Amount; Damages: $8,000.00; Costs: $75.00; Total: $8075.00; Comment: Contract is Canceled.; Party: Names: Tragarz, Tina L; Edwards, Kyle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Denied; Comment: Motion to Vacate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Notice of Appeal of Small Claims Case Filed - Comment: Appeal on the denial of the motion to vacate the small claims judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Bulk Scanned Documents - Comment: 07-26-16 to 08-24-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Document: Other - Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Comment: Def's. Claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2017
  • Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Motion to Vacate - Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued by the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Not Held; Comment: Cont'd in court to this session.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less