This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 22:14:15 (UTC).

Timothy Dauber vs Ron Harper

Case Summary

On 04/21/2016 Timothy Dauber filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ron Harper. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGowen, Beth, Folan, Maureen A, Kirwan, Peter and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4182

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGowen, Beth

Folan, Maureen A

Kirwan, Peter

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dauber, Timothy

Claimant

County of Santa Clara

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Nabrik, inc.

Carry Nations

Harper, Ron

6 & 8 North Santa Cruz Partners, LLC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

6 & 8 North Santa Cruz Partners, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Schaar, Daniel C

Caputo, Paul Francis

Schaar, Daniel C.

Silva, Eva Diane

Shea, Jr., Michael M.

Claimant Attorney

Williams, James R.

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Zygelman, Corine

Wisinski, Matthew Kevin

Rucci, Robert Samuel

Lawler, Jean M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: 6 & 8 North Santa Cruz Partners, LLC; Comment: PARTIAL x-comp w/out prej (atty: Joseph Sweeney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Est. 5 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Order: Ex Parte - Comment: Re: Application to Continue Trial IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the new trial Setting Confernce is set for Sept. 10, 2019 in dept. 19 @ 11:00 am Signed by Judge Kirwan, D19; See Order for Details;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Ex Parte Application - Notice Required - Comment: to Continue Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Old: Pro Per; New: Shea, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to complaint: atty Rucci

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 deposited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Cross-Complaint - Comment: No summons issued. Atty Sweeney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Answer to complt. Atty Sweeney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less