This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 01:18:31 (UTC).

Timothy D. Moon and Malissa J. Moon

Case Summary

On 09/16/2014 Timothy D Moon and Malissa J Moon was filed as a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin, Pennypacker, Philip H and Parker, Kimberly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2377

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Pennypacker, Philip H

Parker, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy D Moon

Gilroy, CA 95020

Petitioner

Moon, Timothy D

Defendant

Malissa J Moon

Respondent

Moon, Malissa J

Minors

Moon, Jaydon Zachary

Moon, Jarod Tomothy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Baker, Lisa M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Name: Moon, Jaydon Zachary; Party: Name: Moon, Jarod Tomothy; Party: Name: Moon, Malissa J; Party: Name: Moon, Timothy D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Fee Waiver -P 09-16-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Judges Notes 07-21-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt/Cert of Mailing Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Declaration: Default/DS/LS - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Stip/Waiver:Final Decl of Disclosure Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Appear/Stip/Waiver Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/FL2336 Decl Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Moot; Comment: Text = re: Confirmation of receipt of report, set per 4-27-15 mins..sb; c/f 8-3-15 mins for Trial Setting..sb Result By = C Result Judge = PHP - Pennypacker, Philip Result Date = 10/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = ON FIRST AMENDED PETITION Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 10/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • Petition: Amended - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Amend Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 10/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Bulk Scanned Documents-Conversion Case - Comment: Bulk Scan 09-16-14 to 10-26-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 09/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Petition: Legal Separation w/minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Legal Sep/Minor Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less