This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/12/2020 at 00:40:47 (UTC).

Tim Dang vs Dung Dang

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Tim Dang filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Dung Dang. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott, Stuart J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1260

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Scott, Stuart J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Dang, Tim

Respondent

Dang, Dung

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nguyen, Teresa T.N.

Respondent Attorney

Wade, Amiel L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSettlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Comment: 12/12, spoke to Savanah, by agmnt, MJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSettlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: 12/12, Savanah called, by agmnt, MJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketSubstitution: Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSettlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Set by agreement per (R) Atty -nc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketFL-NTC OF FAMILY SETL OFCR CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketFL-NTC OF FAMILY SETL OFCR CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketFL-NTC OF FAMILY SETL OFCR CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketFL-NTC OF FAMILY SETL OFCR CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order: Reissuance - Comment: c/f 7-9-18 to 7-26-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order : Support - Judicial Officer: Scott, Stuart J; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: **$30 COURT REPORTER FEE MUST BE PAID PRIOR TO THE COURT HEARING. ** (r) initial s/s-pjn;c/f6/14-ym;c/f7/26-ym;c/f8/30/-ym;c/f10-11-ym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: rsp rfo for s/s

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order (Initial) - Comment: **$30 COURT REPORTER FEE MUST BE PAID PRIOR TO THE COURT HEARING. ** (r) initial s/s

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketResponse: Dissolution - Comment: Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketPetition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less