This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/26/2021 at 18:52:56 (UTC).

Dreyer v. Automation Anywhere, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Dreyer filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Automation Anywhere, Inc . This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Walsh, Brian C and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2730

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Walsh, Brian C

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dreyer, Tiffany

Defendants

Automation Anywhere, Inc.

Automation Anywhere, Inc. DBA Automation Anywhere Parent, Inc.

Automation Anywhere Parent, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shimoda, Galen Tadashi

Hart, Jessica L

Rodriguez, Justin Paul

Berzin, Brittany V

Defendant Attorneys

Desbaillets, Candace

Ghali, Teresa Wang

Tsao, Alison L.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Order

Order & Notice: Demurrer and Motion to Strike FAC HRG reset to 5-27-21; new briefing schedule: Comment: Order & Notice: Hearing on Demurrer/Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint reset from 5/20/21 to 5/27/21; with new briefing schedule - signed/SRK.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC. S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF TIFFANY DREYER S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration

Alision Tsao Declaration ISO Motion to Strike FAC HRG 5-20-21: Comment: DECLARATION OF ALISION TSAO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Memorandum: Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Strike FAC HRG 5-20-21: Comment: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF TIFFANY DREYER S COMPLAINT

Motion: Strike

Motion: Strike FAC HRG 5-20-21: Comment: MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF TIFFANY DREYER S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT HRG 5/20/21

Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC. S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF TIFFANY DREYER S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration

Alision Tsao Declaration ISO Demurrer to FAC HRG 5-20-21: Comment: DECLARATION OF ALISION TSAO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Memorandum: Points and Authorities ISO Demurrer to FAC HRG 5-20-21: Comment: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF TIFFANY DREYER S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Demurrer

Demurrer to First Amended Complaint HRG 5-20-21: Comment: DEMURRER TO PFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT HRG 5/20/21

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

First Amended Complaint: Comment: First Amended Complaint for Damages and Penalties

Notice

Notice: Comment: DEFENDANTS AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC. and AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC., DOING BUSINESS AS AUTOMATION ANYWHERE PARENT, INC. S NOTICE OF REPRESENTATION

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Automation DBA

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Automation

Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Comment: Proof of Service Complex Order

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

Stipulation

Stipulation re Extension of Time to Respond: Comment: STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Dreyer Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf:

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Comment: (2nd CMC) PAGA enforcement action. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 12/7/20, when the case was deemed complex. FAC due 3/19/21 (filed 3/15/21); Demurrer to FAC HRG 3/19/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion: Demurrer and Motion to Strike - First Amended Complaint: Demurrer to First Amended Complaint HRG 5-20-21: Memorandum: Points and Authorities ISO Demurrer to FAC HRG 5-20-21: Alision Tsao Declaration ISO Demurrer to FAC HRG 5-20-21: Proof of Service: Motion: Strike FAC HRG 5-20-21: Memorandum: Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Strike FAC HRG 5-20-21: Alision Tsao Declaration ISO Motion to Strike FAC HRG 5-20-21: Proof of Service: Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: (1) Demurrer by Automation Anywhere, Inc. to the First Amended Complaint; (2) Motion by Automation Anywhere, Inc. to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint. Moving papers due 4/16/21; opposition due 4/30/21 (extended to 5/5/21); reply due 5/7/21 (extended to 5/12/21).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Order & Notice: Demurrer and Motion to Strike FAC HRG reset to 5-27-21; new briefing schedule: Comment: Order & Notice: Hearing on Demurrer/Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint reset from 5/20/21 to 5/27/21; with new briefing schedule - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Proof of Service: Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC. S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF TIFFANY DREYER S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Alision Tsao Declaration ISO Motion to Strike FAC HRG 5-20-21: Comment: DECLARATION OF ALISION TSAO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum: Points and Authorities - Memorandum: Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Strike FAC HRG 5-20-21: Comment: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF TIFFANY DREYER S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOrder: Proposed - Comment: PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) | [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF TIFFANY DREYER S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion: Strike - Motion: Strike FAC HRG 5-20-21: Comment: MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF TIFFANY DREYER S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT HRG 5/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Proof of Service: Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC. S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF TIFFANY DREYER S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Alision Tsao Declaration ISO Demurrer to FAC HRG 5-20-21: Comment: DECLARATION OF ALISION TSAO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice: Comment: of Documented Action. $1,000.00 complex fee taken for Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice: Comment: DEFENDANTS AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC. and AUTOMATION ANYWHERE, INC., DOING BUSINESS AS AUTOMATION ANYWHERE PARENT, INC. S NOTICE OF REPRESENTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Proof of Service: Comment: Proof of Service Complex Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Automation DBA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Automation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Stipulation re Extension of Time to Respond: Comment: STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Dreyer Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Dreyer Summons.pdf:

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant