This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/02/2022 at 09:08:40 (UTC).

Thoroughman Trucking vs Green Earth Management, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/06/2013 Thoroughman Trucking filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Green Earth Management, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5708

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thoroughman Trucking

Defendant

Green Earth Management, Llc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

M. Brook Houghton

P.O. Box 1009

Chico, CA 95927-1009

Defendant Attorney

Edward Francis Cullen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Association/Co-Counsel; Filed By: Thoroughman Trucking,; Comment: Text = PLT associates w/Joseph Selby (530-434-0100) Legacy Name = CV Association of Attys Decision = M Closed = 08/27/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Vacated: settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation; Filed By: Thoroughman Trucking, Green Earth Management, LLC,; Comment: Text = jgmt pending performance. Legacy Name = CV Stipulation Decision = M Closed = 04/07/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Thoroughman Trucking,; Comment: Text = Not one signature on the stipulation is an original. Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 03/20/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Thoroughman Trucking,; Comment: Text = M. Brooks Houghton/Conditional Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 03/21/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Set for:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Thoroughman Trucking,; Comment: Text = atty Houghton Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 02/27/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Thoroughman Trucking,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 02/27/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Thoroughman Trucking, Green Earth Management, LLC,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Thoroughman Trucking, Green Earth Management, LLC,; Comment: Text = Atty: Cullen Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 12/31/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Thoroughman Trucking, Green Earth Management, LLC,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 11/06/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Thoroughman Trucking, Green Earth Management, LLC,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 11/06/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Thoroughman Trucking, Green Earth Management, LLC,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 11/06/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less