This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 19:35:05 (UTC).

Therese Caudill vs John Carrillo

Case Summary

On 04/13/2018 Therese Caudill filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against John Carrillo. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowen, Beth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0290

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

McGowen, Beth

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Caudill, Therese

Therese Caudill

Respondents

Carrillo, John Anthony

John Anthony Carrillo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 75; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 75; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 75; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketDescription: Order: Restraining Order After Hearing; Filed By: Therese Caudill,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Personal; Filed By: Therese Caudill,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Re: Diligence; Filed By: Therese Caudill,; Comment: received: DV- 110,..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Non Service; Comment: received: DV- 110,..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: Request: Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Filed By: Therese Caudill, John Carrillo,; Comment: All granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less