Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/21/2021 at 04:28:39 (UTC).

The Wolf Firm vs All Claimants to Surplus Funds After Trustee's Sale of Real Property

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 The Wolf Firm filed an Other lawsuit against All Claimants to Surplus Funds After Trustee's Sale of Real Property. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kulkarni, Sunil R and Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6087

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The Wolf Firm

Not Classified By Court and Claimants

Aguirre, Cynthia

Youse, Randy

Estate of Ronnie Youse

Cynthia Aguire, TTE

Respondents

All Claimants to Surplus Funds After Trustee's Sale of Real Property

Located At: 1665 Aldrich Way, San Jose, CA 95121

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Manson-Tompkins, Kayo

Claimant Attorney

Soleimanian, Hamid

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketReview: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Rudy, Christopher G; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: *set per 12/3/20 order***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketOrder: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Comment: Motion to deposit surplus funds is STAYED pending proceedings in the Probate Court; A status review hearing shall be set on 5-20-21 at 10:00 AM, signed Judge Kulkarni. [Q 02LM 120920]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketHearing: Motion hearings - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: On Petition to Deposit Surplus Funds by Petitioner The Wolf Firm, A Law Corporation (Kayo Manson-Tompkins) *Continued from 10-6-20*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Objection to Disbursement of Surplus Funds to Cunthia Aguirre.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Randy Youse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Claim for Distribution of Excess Surplus Proceeds.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketHearing: Motion hearings - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: On Petition to Deposit Surplus Funds by Petitioner The Wolf Firm, A Law Corporation (Kayo Manson-Tompkins) *Continued to 12-1-20*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketClerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Env#5039129 First paper fee's are due for Claimant Randy Youse of $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNotice: Change Address/Firm Name - Comment: Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Cynthia Aguirre in Support of Her Claim for Her Share of Surplus Fund

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketClerk Rejection Letter - Comment: RE: Declaration: Pursuant to our courts general rules for E-Filing, we are unable to accept this document via mail. Please submit your documents to the court for processing via electronic filing. Thank you.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice: Entry of Order - Comment: order filed 5-13-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketClerk Rejection Letter - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY: As of February 13,2018, it is now mandatory for all filings submitted by atty's to be submitted electronically. Please visit www.scscourt.org for details regarding electronic filings.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: $269484.90 check deposited per order on 5/13/2020, taken on notice of undocumented action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketOrder - Comment: Re: Petition of Trustee to Deposit Surplus Funds.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketPetition (Unlimited) (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Petition of Trustee to Deposit Surplus Funds.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WOLF FIRM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLEIMANIAN, HAMID