This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:28:11 (UTC).

The Mlnarik Law Group, Inc. vs Kia Friedman et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 The Mlnarik Law Group, Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Kia Friedman. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pierce, Mark H and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1820

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pierce, Mark H

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The Mlnarik Law Group, Inc.

Respondents

Storozinski, Ludette

Friedman, Kia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mlnarik, John Louis

Respondent Attorney

Sall, Michael Aaron

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: The Mlnarik Law Group, Inc.; Friedman, Kia; Storozinski, Ludette; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: RE: Motion for Attorney Fees- Decision on Submitted Matter- DENIED by Judge Arand without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Motion: Order - Original Type: Motion: Order; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: for Attorneys Fees by Def Kia Friedman (Michael A. Sall) *C/F 9/25/18 per Stip/Order*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: HRG 10 04 18 Proposed Order on Defendant Kia Friedman's Objections to Declaration of William W. Winters in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Opposition/Objections - Comment: HRG 10 04 18 Defendant Kia Friedman's Objections to Declaration of William W. Winters in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Response/Reply - Comment: HRG 10/04/18 Defendant Kia Friedman's Reply in Support of Her Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees; Declaration of Michael A. Sall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2018
  • Request: Judicial Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Motion: Judgment on the Pleadings - Comment: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; 5/31/18; 9 AM; D9; Atty Sall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: of Michael Sall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Motion: Leave - Comment: Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint; 5/31/18; 9 AM; D9; Atty Sall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K - Comment: Defendant Kia Friedman's Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff The Mlnarik Law Group

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt - Comment: Robert K. Sall; Rejection of Award and Request for Trial After Attorney-Client Fee Arbitration/ Letter Re Demand for Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Rejection: Arbitration Award by Plt - Comment: Atty Mlnarik

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less