This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/16/2021 at 06:47:06 (UTC).

The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University et al vs International Merchandising Corporation ("IMC") et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against International Merchandising Corporation IMC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7376

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University

Defendants

International Merchandising Corporation ("IMC")

New York Marine & General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Lawrence Allen Tabb

Other Attorneys

Keith Charles Bower

 

Court Documents

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

2/17/2022 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

2/17/2022 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

2/17/2022 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Review: Mediation Status

9/16/2021 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

4/1/2021 Review: Mediation Status

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/17/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

6/17/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

7/2/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/10/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Statement: Case Management Conference

10/5/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

11/10/2020 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

3/16/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

3/17/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee

3/24/2021 Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee

Minute Order

4/1/2021 Minute Order

Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

6/16/2021 Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

Minute Order

9/16/2021 Minute Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 20; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Mediation Status; Department: Department 20; Time: 10:30AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University,; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Mediation Status; Department: Department 20; Time: 10:30AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee; Comment: Notice of Unavailability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: New York Marine & General Insurance Company,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Referral: Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Comment: Case Management Statement 10/20/20 3pm D20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less