This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:46 (UTC).

Thang Tien Lu vs Hien Thi Vo

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Thang Tien Lu filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Hien Thi Vo. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Towery, James E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0166

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Towery, James E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lu, Thang Tien

Respondent

Vo, Hien Thi

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Lu, Thang Tien; Vo, Hien Thi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Comment: 1-3-2019. Granted. Sent to the Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less