This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:30:50 (UTC).

Terry Star vs Erik Bautista

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Terry Star filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Erik Bautista. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C, Zepeda, Carrie and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1856

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Zepeda, Carrie

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Star, Terry

Defendant

Bautista, Erik Diaz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Horowitz, Michael Alan

Atterbury, Jeff B.

Defendant Attorney

Lozano, Claudia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zepeda, Carrie; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: C/F 4-23-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: case management statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Rule 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve - Original Type: OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Demand: Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint; Atty Lozano

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less