This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 17:53:06 (UTC).

In Re Nutanix, Inc. Derivative Litigation (formerly Erwin v. Pandey, et al. (Nutanix, Inc.)) [Lead Case]

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 In Re Nutanix, Inc Derivative Litigation formerly Erwin filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Pandey, Nutanix, Inc Lead Case. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1577

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Teresa Erwin

Defendants

Nutanix, Inc.

Dheeraj Pandey

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laurence Matthew Rosen

Defendant Attorney

Ignacio Evaristo Salceda

Other Attorneys

Phong Le Tran

Frank James Johnson

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/25/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/25/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/25/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Lawsuit Notice

7/26/2019 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Order: Deeming Case Complex

8/2/2019 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/6/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/6/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/6/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/6/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Notice

7/14/2020 Notice

Notice

8/24/2020 Notice

Notice

10/30/2020 Notice

Proof of Service

10/30/2020 Proof of Service

Report

10/30/2020 Report

Notice

2/11/2021 Notice

Proof of Service

2/11/2021 Proof of Service

Report

2/11/2021 Report

Stipulation and Order

3/8/2021 Stipulation and Order

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Dheeraj Pandey, Duston Williams, Louis Attanasio, Kenneth Long III, David Sangster, Sudheesh Vadakkedath, Tyler Wall, Susan Bostrom, Craig Conway, Steven Gomo, John McAdam, Ravi Mhatre, Jeffrey Parks, Michael Scarpelli, Nutanix, Inc.,; Comment: Stipulation & Order Voluntarily Dismissing Action - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC reset from 2/17/21 to 6/9/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: TJ Park,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Report; Filed By: TJ Park,; Comment: Joint Status Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC reset from 11/4/20 to 2/17/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: TJ Park,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Report; Filed By: TJ Park,; Comment: Joint Status Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC reset from 10/30/20 to 11/4/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC reset from 7/31/20 to 10/30/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Report; Filed By: Teresa Erwin, TJ Park,; Comment: Joint Status Report Regarding Status of Federal Derivative Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Teresa Erwin,; Comment: Scarpelli - Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Teresa Erwin,; Comment: Sangster - Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Teresa Erwin,; Comment: Parks - Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Teresa Erwin,; Comment: Pandey - Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/TEK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 11/1/19 at 10am in D5; assigned to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle for all purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Teresa Erwin,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Teresa Erwin,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Teresa Erwin,; Comment: Teresa Erwin, et al. v. Dheeraj Pandey, et al. Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less