This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:22:30 (UTC).

TD Bank USA, N.A. vs Blanca Davalos-Vargas

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 TD Bank USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Blanca Davalos-Vargas. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2586

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA, N.A.

Defendant

Davalos-Vargas, Blanca E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boone, Stephanie J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: TD Bank USA, N.A.; Awarded Against: Davalos-Vargas, Blanca E.; Amount; Damages: $1,696.54; Costs: $325.57; Total: $2022.11; Party: Names: TD Bank USA, N.A.; Davalos-Vargas, Blanca E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: $2,022.11 [E-SERVED 5/15/19]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Default Entered - Comment: [E-SERVED 5/15/19]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less