This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/27/2022 at 04:44:13 (UTC).

Taylor Mann vs Kathryn Haren

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Taylor Mann filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Kathryn Haren. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1010

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Taylor Mann

Respondent

Kathryn Haren

Minor

Sakara Haren

Other

OFFICE OF PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Marilyn Edith Moreno

Michael Hector Moreno

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: DVRO-CLETS; Filed By: Taylor Mann,; Comment: Proof of Service: DVRO-CLETS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order: Restraining Order After Hearing; Filed By: Taylor Mann,; Comment: Order: Restraining Order After Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order; Comment: AMNEDED from HRG 6/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: TRO Mod (with c/c c/v); Department: Department 72; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: TRO Mod (with c/c c/v); Department: Department 72; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 72; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 72; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 72; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 72; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 72; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 72; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 72; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 72; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 72; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 72; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: Taylor Mann,; Comment: Memorandum: Points and Authorities

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request: Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Filed By: Taylor Mann, Kathryn Haren,; Comment: (p) all denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request: Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Filed By: Taylor Mann, Kathryn Haren,; Comment: (p) all denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less