This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:28:01 (UTC).

Tasha Quinonez vs Douglas Campbell

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Tasha Quinonez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Douglas Campbell. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1816

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quinonez, Tasha Marie

Defendant

Campbell, Douglas John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elder, Kevin Lorne

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Quinonez, Tasha Marie; Campbell, Douglas John; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Elder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Elder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fee deposited by atty Elder for plaintiff Tasha Quinonez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement (Statements)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less