This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:32:16 (UTC).

Tammy Lynn De Fiore vs Darryl Arthur De Fiore

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Tammy Lynn De Fiore filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Darryl Arthur De Fiore. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0176

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

De Fiore, Tammy Lynn

Claimant

California Public Employees' Retirement System

Respondent

De Fiore, Darryl Arthur

Minor

De Fiore, Jake Giovanni

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • Request: Joinder - Comment: employee benefit plan: California Public Employees' Retirement System

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Pleading on Joinder - Employees Benefit Plan - Comment: employee benefit plan: California Public Employees' Retirement System

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Summons/Joinder - Comment: employee benefit plan: California Public Employees' Retirement System

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Comment: Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: response, uccjea...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Comment: Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Comment: Declaration Re: UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Response: Dissolution - Comment: Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less