This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:31:43 (UTC).

Tae Lee vs Matthew Folsom

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Tae Lee filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Matthew Folsom. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dietz, Larry, Williams, Benjamin and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2564

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dietz, Larry

Williams, Benjamin

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lee, Tae Young

Defendant

Folsom, Matthew Joseph

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Dietz, Larry; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Lee, Tae Young; Awarded Against: Folsom, Matthew Joseph; Amount; Damages: $240.00; Costs: $50.00; Total: $290.00; Comment: (***Amended to include judg't amt on Judg't Notice--Amended Judg't Notice mailed on 11/30/18.); Party: Names: Lee, Tae Young; Folsom, Matthew Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Williams, Benjamin; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Comment: Comment (Per Minute Order case is dismissed without prejudice. No appearance.); Party: Names: Lee, Tae Young; Folsom, Matthew Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Dietz, Larry; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims) - Comment: Amended (on 11/30/18 to specify judg't amt.--mailed on 11/30/18.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Order Vacating/Setting Aside Judgment - Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: POS on: Request For Action/Order of Court filed 9/21/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Copy of Small Claims Order Of Court Allowing Matter to be Reset & Filed on 03/02/18. Filed on 03/02/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Order - Comment: SMALL CLAIMS ORDER;The matter is re-set. Neither party appeared and plaintiff requested a postponement. Defendant was not served timely, so plaintiff has to serve defendant with the new court date. The clerk shall mail to both parties. Commissioner Copeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less

    Read MoreRead Less