This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 23:20:08 (UTC).

T. G. et al vs Davis Grininger et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 T G filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Davis Grininger. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Folan, Maureen A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6383

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Folan, Maureen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

T. G.

S. S.

Defendants

Santa Clara University

SIGMA CHI CORPORATION

LAMBDA GAMMA CHAPTER

SIGMA CHI FRATERNITY

Sigma Fraternity

Davis Grininger

Andre Blair

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacobs, Elana R

Elana R Jacobs

Defendant Attorneys

Wall, J. Joseph, Jr.

Fitzsimmons, Marcie Isom

Marcie Isom Fitzsimmons

Cahill, Jonathan C

Jessica Brynn Coffield

Jonathan C Cahill

Dirk Lenord Manoukian

J. Joseph Wall

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

2/15/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

2/15/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

2/15/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

2/15/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

2/15/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

2/15/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/29/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/29/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/15/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

5/15/2020 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

7/1/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

7/8/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

7/14/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Mail

7/14/2020 Proof of Service: Mail

Notice

8/25/2021 Notice

Request: Dismissal

9/23/2021 Request: Dismissal

Minute Order

10/7/2021 Minute Order

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Demurrer; Department: Department 2; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: T. G.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: SIGMA CHI CORPORATION, SIGMA CHI FRATERNITY,; Comment: 10-7-21 9am dept.2 Amended Notice re; Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Stay; Department: Department 2; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: T. G., S. S., SIGMA CHI CORPORATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: T. G., S. S.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: T. G., S. S., Andre Blair,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: T. G., Santa Clara University,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: T. G., S. S.,; Comment: AMENDED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: T. G., S. S.,; Comment: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: T. G., S. S.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: T. G., S. S.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: T. G., S. S.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIGMA CHI CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Brynn Coffield

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fitzsimmons, Marcie Isom

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANOUKIAN DIRK LENORD