This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/16/2021 at 22:04:16 (UTC).

Sylvia Blanch vs The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Jose

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Sylvia Blanch filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Jose. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0405

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sylvia Blanch

Defendant

The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arlo Garcia Uriarte

Defendant Attorneys

Michael W. M. Manoukian

Eric Christophe Bellafronto

 

Court Documents

Review: Mediation Status

10/14/2021 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

10/14/2021 Review: Mediation Status

Conference: Further Case Management

5/25/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

5/25/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/14/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/14/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/13/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/9/2020 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/4/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service

1/5/2021 Proof of Service

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/5/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

1/22/2021 Minute Order

Minute Order

5/25/2021 Minute Order

Minute Order

10/18/2021 Minute Order

Notice: Settlement

11/1/2021 Notice: Settlement

Proof of Service

12/7/2021 Proof of Service

Request: Dismissal

12/7/2021 Request: Dismissal

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Sylvia Blanch,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Sylvia Blanch,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Sylvia Blanch,; Comment: Notice: Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Mediation Status; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:30AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Referral: Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order: ADR; Filed By: The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Jose,; Comment: ADR Stipulation is GRANTED; Further Case Management Conference to remain as set, signed Judge Kirwan. [Env# 6468569]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Sylvia Blanch,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Sylvia Blanch,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Sylvia Blanch,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Jose,; Comment: HRG: 1/19/21 Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Jose,; Comment: TBD by court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Sylvia Blanch,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Sylvia Blanch,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sylvia Blanch,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Sylvia Blanch,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SAN JOSE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer URIARTE, ARLO G.