This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 06:30:01 (UTC).

SV Income Properties vs C. Medlin

Case Summary

On 11/03/2008 SV Income Properties filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against C Medlin. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1325

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sv Income Properties

Defendant

Charles Medlin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2009
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Text = with notice returned to small claims court Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 11/06/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • DocketDescription: Order: Submitted Matter; Filed By: SV Income Properties, Charles Medlin,; Comment: Text = Judgment after Trial De Novo Judgement of the Small Claims Court, in favor of Resp/Plt Michael Shields against Appellant/Def Charles Medlin in amount of $3550.00 Signed by Judge Bondonno Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = R Closed = 10/27/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • HearingDescription: Trial De Novo; Department: Department 7; Time: 8:45AM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • HearingDescription: Trial De Novo; Department: Department 5; Time: 8:45AM; Result: Continued: Future Month

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of Resched SC Trial Decision = M Closed = 07/06/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Appeal (Small Claims); Filed By: Charles Medlin,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal Decision = R Closed = 10/23/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing; Filed By: Charles Medlin,; Comment: Text = Mailed Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal to Pltf. Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 05/27/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 57; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Heard: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: SV Income Properties,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 04/29/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2009
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Text = Order of Court as to Request for Action for Defendant's Request to Postpone. Commissioner Steinagrt orders as follows: 1) deny request to reschedule at this time. 2) remain as scheduled. Legacy Name = SC Order of Court Decision = M Closed = 03/16/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing; Comment: Text = mailed to both parties: Notice Re: Request to Postpone Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • DocketDescription: Request: Postponement (Small Claims); Filed By: Charles Medlin,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2009
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 58; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2009
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2008
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing; Filed By: SV Income Properties, Charles Medlin,; Comment: Text = Defendant's Request for Continuance was received less than 10 days before the court date. There is not sufficient time to review your request and notify both parties. Your request will be submitted with the file at the court hearing. IF YOU ARE NOT PRESENT AT THE HEARING: if your request is granted, you will be notified by mail; if your request is denied, the case may be heard as a default in your absence. Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2008
  • DocketDescription: Request: Postponement (Small Claims); Filed By: Charles Medlin,; Comment: Text = Request received less then 10 days prior to hearing; request attached to file to be reviewed by Commissioner at time of hearing. Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: SV Income Properties,; Comment: Text = pers serv Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000; Filed By: SV Income Properties,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 11/03/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less