This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 12:25:40 (UTC).

Sutter's Place, Inc. vs CITY OF SAN JOSE et al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Sutter's Place, Inc filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CITY OF SAN JOSE. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Manoukian, Socrates P and Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7181

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Manoukian, Socrates P

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bay 101

Sutter's Place, Inc.

Defendants

CITY OF SAN JOSE

CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McManis, James H.

James H. McManis

Defendant Attorney

Yue-Han Chow

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

2/8/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Statement: Case Management Conference

6/4/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

2/8/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service

8/25/2021 Proof of Service

Notice: Related Cases

7/22/2021 Notice: Related Cases

Motion: Consolidate

8/25/2021 Motion: Consolidate

Minute Order

9/2/2021 Minute Order

Declaration: In Support

3/16/2021 Declaration: In Support

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Demurrer; Department: Department 20; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion: Consolidate; Filed By: CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Related Cases; Filed By: Sutter's Place, Inc.,; Comment: 21cv376617

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Related Cases; Filed By: CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE,; Comment: 21cv376617

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Demurrer; Filed By: CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE,; Comment: 9-2-21 9am dept.20 Demurrer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE,; Comment: 9-2-21 9am dept.20 Memo ISO Demurrer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit: Proof of Publication; Filed By: Sutter's Place, Inc.,; Comment: Affidavit: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit: Proof of Publication; Filed By: Sutter's Place, Inc.,; Comment: Affidavit: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Ex Parte Application - Notice Required; Filed By: Sutter's Place, Inc.,; Comment: to Approve Form of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: Sutter's Place, Inc.,; Comment: granting plt's ex parte appl to approve form of summons, signed by Judge Manoukian. Plt shall publish summons in the San Jose Post-Record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sutter's Place, Inc., CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Sutter's Place, Inc.,; Comment: of Tyler Atkinson ISO Ex Parte

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sutter's Place, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Sutter's Place, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Sutter's Place, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sutter's Place, Inc. a California Corportion doing business as Bay 101 Casino is a litigant