This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/02/2022 at 14:00:00 (UTC).

Sushant Koyate and Shraddha Koyate

Case Summary

On 02/28/2014 Sushant Koyate and Shraddha Koyate was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2066

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sushant Koyate

Respondent

Shraddha Koyate

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Shannon Stein

438 South Murphy Ave

Sunnyvale, CA 94086

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2014
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 82; Time: 9:30AM; Result: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Sushant Koyate,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final); Filed By: Sushant Koyate,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Service of Final Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Default/DS/LS; Filed By: Sushant Koyate,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336; Filed By: Sushant Koyate,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/FL2336 Decl Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family); Filed By: Sushant Koyate,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt/Cert of Mailing Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • DocketDescription: FC 2336 Packet Received for Review; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = G Closed = 12/09/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Sushant Koyate,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL Req: Entry of Default Decision = G Closed = 10/28/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Sushant Koyate,; Comment: Text = served Amended FL 100, FL 110, etc...(Hague Convention) Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/02/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Sushant Koyate,; Comment: Text = petition, summons... Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/03/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 82; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sushant Koyate,; Comment: Text = Amended Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/24/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sushant Koyate,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/28/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution no minor; Filed By: Sushant Koyate,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 02/28/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Sushant Koyate,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 02/28/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Sushant Koyate,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 02/28/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • DocketDescription: Miscellaneous: Converted Document; Comment: Sushant Koyate and Shraddha Koyate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stein, Shannon