This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 01:20:43 (UTC).

SUPER PAK INC. vs PARVIZ SOLAIMANI et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 SUPER PAK INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PARVIZ SOLAIMANI. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9962

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUPER PAK INC.

Defendants

PARVIZ MILTON SOLAIMANI

UNITED FOOD DELICACIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Landsman

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

10/20/2021 Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/20/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/15/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/15/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Default Pending

12/15/2021 Default Pending

Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

12/16/2021 Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

Default Pending

12/20/2021 Default Pending

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/20/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Court Trial: Short Cause

10/17/2022 Court Trial: Short Cause

Court Trial: Short Cause

10/17/2022 Court Trial: Short Cause

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Court Trial: Short Cause; Department: Department 1; Time: 8:46AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: SUPER PAK INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Default Pending; Filed By: SUPER PAK INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K; Filed By: PARVIZ SOLAIMANI,; Comment: To Plaintiff's Complaint, In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Default Pending; Filed By: SUPER PAK INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: SUPER PAK INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: SUPER PAK INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K; Filed By: SUPER PAK INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: SUPER PAK INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SUPER PAK INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANDSMAN PHILIP LAW OFFICES OF