This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 07:29:16 (UTC).

Sunshine Tailfeathers and Ellsworth Tailfeathers

Case Summary

On 01/14/2014 Sunshine Tailfeathers and Ellsworth Tailfeathers was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin and Pennypacker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2049

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Pennypacker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunshine Tailfeathers

Gilroy, CA 95020

Petitioner

Tailfeathers, Sunshine

Defendant

Ellsworth Tailfeathers

Respondent

Tailfeathers, Ellsworth

Minor

Tailfeathers, Noelani

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Fee Waiver -P 01-14-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Cancelled set for e-review; Comment: Text = set per petition filed 1-14-14 gj.; c/f 10-28-14 mins,ry Result By = C Result Judge = IJ - Joseph, Irwin Result Date = 11/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • Notice: Cancelled Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Cancelled Status Conference Decision = M Closed = 11/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • Notice: FTA at Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:FTA at Status Conference Decision = M Closed = 10/31/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Future Month; Comment: Text = set per petition filed 1-14-14 gj.; c/f 5-6-14 mins,ry Result By = C Result Judge = IJ - Joseph, Irwin Result Date = 10/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • Notice: FTA at Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:FTA at Status Conference Decision = M Closed = 05/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Future Month; Comment: Text = set per petition filed 1-14-14 gj. Result By = C Result Judge = IJ - Joseph, Irwin Result Date = 05/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Request for Order: Custody/Visitation - Original Type: Request for Order: Custody/Visitation; Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Stipulation and order; Comment: Text = (P) spousal support gj. Result By = C Result Judge = IJ - Joseph, Irwin Result Date = 03/04/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Stipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = re: child custody/visitation. Legacy Name = FL Stip and Order Decision = M Closed = 03/04/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = re: Ptn, summs, blank resp. Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = Granted in Whole Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 01/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Bulk Scanned Documents - Comment: Bulk Scan 01-14-14 to 04-22-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Request for Order: Child Custody/Visitation - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = spousal support Legacy Name = FL Req for Ord:Custody/Visitation Closed = 03/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less