This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:30:37 (UTC).

Student Loan Solutions, LLC vs Thong Nguyen et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Student Loan Solutions, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Thong Nguyen. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1853

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Student Loan Solutions, LLC

Successor in Interest to Bank of America, N.A.

Defendants

Nguyen, Thong V

Nguyen, Thong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Booska, Steven A.

Defendant Attorney

Henwood, Drew Flippin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Student Loan Solutions, LLC; Nguyen, Thong V; Nguyen, Thong; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Court Trial: Short Cause - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:46 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: ***pending***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration re Lost Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: ***pending***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Default Pending - Comment: ***pending***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K - Comment: to Complaint; Atty Henwood

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Thong V Nguyen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: For 1st amended complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Complaint: Amended - Comment: FIRST; Atty Booska

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less